Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Keck, Melissa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sda Law Group, Shaumyan & Derbarseghian Llp, against City Of Hesperia, County Of San Bernardino, Does 1 Through 50, San Bernardino County, represented by Bordin Semmer Llp, County Counsel, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David E Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E Driscoll Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion re:
Date: March 01, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: March 06, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 01, 2024Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 21, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 12, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: January 05, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 06, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 10, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 04, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 12, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 26, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: September 01, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Answer Filed
Date: July 24, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 20, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 19, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically DEFENDANT CITY OF HESPERIA S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF MELISSA KECK S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically to Demurrer |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically PLAINTIFF S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSE TO DEPOSITION NOTICE AND RELATED DOCUMENT REQUESTS |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Motion to Compel |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Separate Statement Filed | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed as to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.