Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Gastelum, Ramon Humberto, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Williams, Beck & Forbes, against Best Buy Purchasing Llc, Best Buy Stores, L.P., Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, represented by Law Offices Of Garber, Av & Duncan, Law Offices Of Kevin Garcia, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Ramon Humberto Gastelum against Best Buy Stores, L.P. and Does 1 to 100. The complaint alleges causes of action for property damage, wrongful death, and personal injury. The jurisdiction of the case i...
Complaint Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 15, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 17, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 28, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: October 12, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 19, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 27, 2023Answer Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 08, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 04, 2024Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Attachment to Minute Order
Date: January 08, 2024Motion re:
Date: February 22, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 29, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 19, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: July 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 02, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
April 09, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion re: to Consolidate Actions filed by defendant Best Buy Purchasing LLC on complaint filed 05/15/23 |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60 eFile paid on 03/18/24 for motion |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #14359578. Mtn to consolidate actions submitted with incorrect fees. |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of minute order 1/08/2024 |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Attachment to Minute Order Ruling on Peremptory Challenge 170.6 |
|
January 08, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.