Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Castro, Gabriela, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano Stancroff Pc, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Kia America, Inc, represented by Gates Gonter Guy Proudfoot & Muench Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Gabriela Castro against Kia America, Inc. The complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Act and the Magnuson-Moss Act.
Complaint Filed
Date: March 20, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 20, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 06, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2025 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 09, 2025 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 21, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement (Statements) |
|
November 06, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $150 from efile paid on 1/5/24 for posted jury fees |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed - $150.00 (Notices) | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Protective Order |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $20.00 paid by ch for Stip fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.