Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rutherford, James, filed a(n) Civil Rights Unlimited case represented by Manning Law, Apc, against Chaampa Enterprises, Inc., Does 1-10, Does 2-10, Hughes Markets, Inc., Lee, Im Myung, (total of 7) See All represented by Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Rights Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed High Frequency Litigant
Date: February 07, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 29, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 18, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed
Date: July 21, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 14, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Defendant Nancy Hyonam Lee & (Im Myung Lee Not Answering as Sued) |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435 ck paid on 8/7/23 for answer fee |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed of Defendant In Myung Lee on Complaint |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Filed as to Defendant | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: filed by plaintiff on 06/29/23 |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed filed by plaintiff on 06/29/23 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.