Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gurstel Law Firm, Pc, against Perez, Patricia Luna, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Kory Mathewson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Gurstel Law Firm, P.C. on behalf of their client, American Express National Bank, against Patricia Luna Perez. The complaint alleges that Patricia Luna Perez owes a debt to American Express National Bank. T...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 30, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: January 30, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 30, 2023Declaration re:
Date: April 08, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 15, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 15, 2023Proof of Service of Summons/Comp Unserved Electronically Fil
Date: October 11, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 30, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: May 10, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: January 08, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 |
Department R12 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Mathewson, Kory |
||
April 15, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Order to Show Cause Hearing |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons/Comp Unserved Electronically Fil | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
April 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
April 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.