Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against $30,670.00 U.S. Currency, $5,993.02 U.S. Currency, $772.47 U.S. Currency, $938.74 U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Proof of Publication re:
Date: February 26, 2024Proof of Publication re:
Date: February 26, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: February 26, 2024Petition for Forfeiture
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Supplemental Petition for Asset Forfeiture Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication re: served Congdi Sun, served 12/22/23, 12/29/2023, 1/5/24, 1/12/24 |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication re: served Jie Dong, served 12/22/23, 12/29/23, 1/5/24, 1/12/24 |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed as to served on Dec. 22,29 2023 and Jan 05,12 2024 |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: | |
January 30, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed | |
October 20, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Ex-Parte Application for Notice of Service by Publication as to Jie Dong |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.