Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Huh, Sung Kyoo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nita Law Firm, against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Hyundai Motor America, represented by Theta Law Firm, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: January 03, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 08, 2024Answer Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Objection Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Judgment Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 05, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 14, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Electronically filed | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICAS OBJECTIONS TO THE JUDGMENT |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed DEFENDANT HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA'S OBJECTIONS TO THE JUDGMENT |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Filed | |
November 14, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Plaintiff Sung Jyoo Huh's Acceptance of Defendant Hyundai Motor America's CCP 998 Offer to Compromise |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed filed by Defendant filed on 8/2/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.