Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Saenz Cortez Jr., Luis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Mendez, Arturo, represented by Martinez, Dietrich & Zarcone Legal Group, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the attorney Melissa M. Thom on behalf of the plaintiff, Luis Saenz Cortez Jr. The case is being heard in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case number is CIVSBZEOObotf. The co...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 10, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: February 10, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 10, 2023Answer Filed
Date: March 20, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: March 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: May 26, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: May 26, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Motion re:
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: May 26, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 10, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: August 10, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: August 10, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 10, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
May 08, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney Filed | |
August 16, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed filed by defendant Arturo Mendez |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed filed by defendant Arturo Mendez |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Re: Discovery Conferences |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Order filed | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Minute Order, Initial Trial Setting Order, Discovery Order, and Trial Court Orders. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.