Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beck, David O, Carrillo, Dennis, Fortunato, Michael R, Houser, Harold E, Hoyt, Kevin, (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Civil Rights Unlimited case represented by Hannemann Law Firm, Hannemann Law Firm, A Professional Corporation, against Bonta, Robert, represented by Attorney General Of California, Morrison & Foerster, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Rights Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: July 13, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Notice Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 03, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 03, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 25, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
September 29, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order signed and Filed Protective Order |
|
September 19, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Filed JOINT |
|
August 02, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
July 20, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Filed to: JOINT RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC RE CONSOLIDATION |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: minute order regarding related cases |
|
May 26, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.