Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
De La Rosa Davila, Lucia, Rodriguez, Manuel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices, Apc, against Does 1-10, General Motors, General Motors, Llc, represented by Erskine Law Group, Apc, Erskine Law Group, Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: February 16, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 07, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: September 26, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: September 27, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 16, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: April 17, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 20, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: October 20, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: April 17, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 24, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: November 29, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: October 26, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 24, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: April 10, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: April 10, 2024Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 24, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: February 16, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: February 16, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 30, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 24, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 02, 2024Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 04, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 17, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 24, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically REPLY IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL MOTORS LLC S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL MOTORS LLC S MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between VOLUME 1 contains documents from 12/30/22-09/26/23 09/26/23-PRESENT |
|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Volume Begins on this Date VOLUME 2 contains documents from 09/26/23-PRESENT |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed GENERAL MOTORS LLC S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike GENERAL MOTORS LLC S NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.