Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sanchez, Maria, Sanchez, Roberto, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Auto Fraud Legal Center Llp, against Capital One, National Association, Doe 1, Does 2 Through 75, Inclusive, San Bernardino Motors, Inc., Subaru Of San Bernardino, (total of 6) See All represented by Mundell Odlum & Haws, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 19, 2024Answer Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 21, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 03, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: October 30, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 21, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: December 21, 2022Jury Fees Posted
Date: September 13, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 13, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: April 10, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 13, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 21, 2022Proof of Electronic Service
Date: December 21, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: May 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
January 22, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Stipulation re: Arbitration and order |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Arbitration and to stay proceedings |
|
October 03, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Fees Posted | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Appearance re: Attorney Daniel Medina |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.