Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against $380.00 U.S. Currency, $751.00 U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2022 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 27, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 09, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Petition for Forfeiture
Date: December 07, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 06, 2023Motion Filed Re:
Date: November 17, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: January 10, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 11, 2023Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: August 11, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 07, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 27, 2023Claim Opposing Forfeiture Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Order signed and Filed | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court orders Answer Stricken as to Claim of Jessica Hernandez |
|
January 10, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Re: striking claim of Jessica Hernandez as untimely |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 495.00 - FIRST APPEARANCE AND MOTION |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Motion to strike returned. Motion not reserved. To reserve a motion please call our civil clerks office at 909.708.8678 or email at SBJC-CivilMotionReservationRequests@SB-Court.org. |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
October 02, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed as to Notice of seizure and intended forfeiture |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.