Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Pellis, Brian, Vasek, John, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Offices Of Goldberg & Gage, against City Of San Bernardino, Does 1-100, represented by Atkinson Andelson Loya Rudd & Romo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 15, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 03, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: January 02, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 06, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 08, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: December 28, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: November 22, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: March 29, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: December 22, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: September 18, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 05, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 23, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: December 14, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 24, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 23, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 06, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: March 12, 2024Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: June 06, 2023Amended Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 01, 2022Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: April 02, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: April 05, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 28, 2024Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Declaration re:
Date: March 28, 2024Notice Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: February 13, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: April 03, 2024Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: April 03, 2024Tentative decisions
Date: December 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
June 17, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 26, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 16, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 60.00 paid |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed OF SUSANA SOLANO ISO DEF CITY OF SB OPPO TO PLA MTC FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES EMPLOYMENT LAW SET ONE. |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SUSANA P. SOLANO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF SAN BERNARDINOS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS PELLIS AND VASEKS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-EMPLOYMENT LAW, SET ONE (Declarations) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.