Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zwicker & Associates, against Does 1-10, Inclusive, Ibanez Jr, Juan P, represented by Litigation Practice Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication
Date: May 22, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Proof of Service
Date: May 22, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 20, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: May 22, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 27, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Gilbert, Ronald J |
||
November 17, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 05, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.