Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Advocates For The Envirorment, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited case against City Of Rialto, Does 1 Through 10, Qr Birtcher Willow Ave. Owner Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2022 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified petition for a writ of mandate filed by Advocates for the Environment against the City of Rialto. The case number is CIVSB2222896. The petition is related to the California Environmental Quality Act (CEQA) and seeks a wri...
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: March 27, 2023Stipulation Filed re:
Date: January 31, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: December 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: December 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Proof of Service
Date: December 16, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: January 21, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 30, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: January 31, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed with prejudice; filed by Plainitff on 3.24.23 |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
February 14, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
February 14, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed re: Concerning the Administrative Record |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Filed Re: Request for Hearing filed by Advocates for the Enviornment |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60 check payment for Request for Hearing |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): request for hrg need to pay $60 |
|
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.