Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Oscar, Avila, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Perez & Perez, against City Of Rialto, Does 1-30, Murty, Justin, Taramona, Anthony, represented by Burke, Williams & Sorensen Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal summons notifying the defendant that they are being sued by the plaintiff. The defendant is named as the City of Rialto, Justin Murty, and Anthony Taramona, along with 30 other individuals. The summons states that the defend...
Order Filed Re:
Date: April 11, 2024Answer Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 08, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Motion to Stay
Date: April 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 04, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 04, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 25, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 05, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: December 11, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 25, 2024Reply Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Order granting stipulation to lift stay of proceedings |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document(s) received via FileSubmit ITSCS |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed STIPULATION TO LIFT STAY OF PROCEEDINGS |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HANDLING ATTORNEY (Notices) |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Order to maintain stay of case pending criminal proceedings |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Orders Matter Stayed Pending the resolution of criminal charges |
|
October 23, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.