Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Remedy Bail Bonds, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Attorney At Law, against Does 1 To 10, Martin, Juan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2022 |
CategoryOther Collections $10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 07, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued and Filed Filed by plaintiff Remedy Bail Bonds filed 10/05/2022 |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $390 cc paid on 2/7/2023. $380 for new filing and $10 for fax fees. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.