Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lopez, Ademir, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, General Motors Llc, represented by Erskine Law Group, Pc, The Erskine Law Group, Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 01, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 29, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 29, 2024Notice Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 01, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 01, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 17, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 20, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 05, 2024Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 17, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 16, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 29, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
August 01, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 13, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically (Comment) | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion Filed Electronically (Motions) | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Separate Statement Filed (Statements) | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed (Declarations) | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed Plaintiff Ademir Lopez separate statement in support of motion to compel further responses to requests for production of documents. |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to compel further responses to requests for production of documents filed by plaintiff Ademir Lopez. | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Phil A Thomas in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to requests for production of documents filed by plaintiff Ademir Lopez. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.