Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Vega, Ricardo Calvillo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Haftavani Law Group, against Does 1 Through 20 Inclusive, Vela, Helida, represented by Martinez, Dieterich, Zarcone, Legal Group, Martinez, Dietrich & Zarcone Legal Group, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd $10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: February 27, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 02, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 05, 2024Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: February 27, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: February 27, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 21, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Balance Due on Case
Date: January 18, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Answer Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 21, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2025 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
January 09, 2025 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed to compel / form interrogatories |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed to compel / special interrogatories |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed to compel / demands for inspection and copying ... |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to compel / form interrogatories (set one) |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to compel / production of documents |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to compel / special interrogatories (set one) |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.