Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Desantis, Kate, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Offices Of David Vasquez, Apc, against Does 1-20, Uk International Soccer Camps, Inc., represented by Dearn Law, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Amended Complaint Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 10, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 10, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: April 05, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 17, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: August 07, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 10, 2022Motion for Order
Date: August 07, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 02, 2024Proof of Service
Date: October 10, 2023Balance Due on Case
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 10, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 06, 2024Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Notice Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service electronic service of notice of OSC RE: defendantsfailure to appear |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Notice of OSC RE: Defendants Counsel failure to appear |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of OSC RE: Defendant's counsel failure to appear |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed OSc RE; Failure to appear |
|
January 30, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed (Declarations) | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed (Notices) | |
October 10, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.