Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Clean Initiative Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by The Morgan Law Group, against California Automobile Insurance Company, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Mercury Insurance Services, Llc, represented by Wesierski & Zurek Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2022 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended complaint for damages filed by Clean Initiative LLC against Mercury Insurance Services LLC and Does 1 through 10 in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. Clean Initiative LLC is a C...
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: January 25, 2024Demurrer Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 20, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 02, 2022Reply Filed
Date: May 01, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 06, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 29, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: December 18, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 08, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 22, 2024Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Motion to Strike
Date: March 22, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 26, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 02, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 25, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically (Comment) | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement (Statements) |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Plaintiff Clean Initiative LLC's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Attorney Jason A. Roberge in Support of Clean Initiative LLC's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Trial Setting Conference Statement |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Trial Setting Conference Statement |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Comment) | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed filed by defendant California Automobile Insurance Company on complaint filed 08/24/2023 |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT A. WALLER, JR. FOR PLAINTIFF CLEAN INITIATIVE LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.