Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Valenzuela Iii, Ernest Michael, Valenzuela, Michelle, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bisnar & Chase, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Mczeal, Ada, Moore, Julius, represented by Macdonald & Cody, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. It appears to be related to a civil case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff/petitioner is Michelle Valenzuela, and the defendant/respo...
Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: April 12, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 12, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: April 12, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: April 12, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 18, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 21, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 10, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 04, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 09, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 23, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 19, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 23, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 03, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: April 03, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: April 03, 2023Balance Due on Case
Date: July 06, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 07, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
February 27, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $150.00 check for jury fees |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between VOL. 2 -- 07/03/23 - PRESENT |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between VOL. 1 -- 08/10/22 - 04/12/23 |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Filed | |
July 18, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
July 17, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Order Filed Ruling Re: Defendant Ada McZeal's Motions to Compel Further Resposnes heard 07/17/23-07/18/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.