Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Rodriguez, Bernardo Horta, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Does 1-10, represented by Bowman & Brooke Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 08, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 08, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 10, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 21, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 21, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Advanced Jury Fees Posted
Date: March 07, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 22, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Reply Filed
Date: July 26, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 05, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: June 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
November 30, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed GENERAL CIVIL CASE AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM (Comment) |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement (Statements) |
|
September 19, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
August 02, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed to Opposition to Motion to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.