Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Rosena Ranch Community Association, Rosen Ranch Community Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Delphi Law Group, Llp, Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp, against Does 1 To 20, Zhang, Yan, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration re:
Date: December 30, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: January 09, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: December 13, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 17, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: March 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 19, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 02, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: September 01, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: June 15, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 08, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 17, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Proof of Service
Date: April 09, 2024Amended Cross Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: January 31, 2024Court Order Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: April 09, 2024Proof of Service
Date: December 30, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 02, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 08, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 21, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: April 08, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 27, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 23, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 28, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 03, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: September 01, 2023Court Order Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 17, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: November 14, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: March 07, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 23, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 13, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: September 01, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 10, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 18, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 17, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 01, 2024Amended Proof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed
Date: November 01, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: April 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
February 20, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
May 02, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
April 16, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MOTION FILED 4/9/24 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Terminating Sanctions | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed NOTICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT YAN ZHANG S NON-OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT ROSENA RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed NOTICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT YAN ZHANG S NON-OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT ROSENA RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION S MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed Order Granting Plaintiff's Notice and Motion for Orders by mail. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.