Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Torres, Daladiel, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group, Llp, against Does 1-10, General Motors Llc, represented by Erskine Law Group, Pc, The Erskine Law Group, Apc, The Erskine Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: October 25, 2023Proof of Service
Date: March 26, 2024Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 02, 2022Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: September 20, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 19, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 07, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 20, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 06, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 20, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: February 13, 2024Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: April 09, 2024Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT THAT VEHICLE INSURANCE AND REGISTRATION INCURRED AFTER THE VEHICLE QUALIFIED FOR A REPURCHASE ARE NOT RECOVERABLE UNDER THE SONG- BEVERLY ACT, OR ARE OTHERWISE THE STANDARD COSTS OF OWNERSHIP |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY REGARDING ATTORNEY FEES, ATTORNEY ADVERTISING OR ATTORNEY DRIVEN LITIGATION AND OTHER ATTACK OR CRITICISM OF PLAINTIFF S COUNSEL |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR REFERENCE REGARDING DEFENDANT S ARBITRATION PROGRAM |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT THAT AN AUTHORIZED DEALERSHIP IS NOT DEFENDANT S AGENT DURING WARRANTY REPAIRS AND SALE |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO ANY SETTLEMENT OFFERS OR NEGOTIATIONS |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT THAT PLAINTIFFS DID NOT MAKE SUFFICIENT EFFORTS TO ASK DEFENDANT TO REPURCHASE OR REPLACE THE VEHICLE |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PROHIBIT EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT PLAINTIFFS MISUSED, ABUSED, OR FAILED TO MAINTAIN THE VEHICLE |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically GENERAL MOTORS LLC S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PROHIBIT ARGUMENT OR TESTIMONY THAT DEFENDANT CONFORMED THE VEHICLE WITHIN A REASONABLE NUMBER OF REPAIR ATTEMPTS BECAUSE DEFENDANT REPAIRED A PARTICULAR COMPONENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.