Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kingdom Of Sweden, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Ernest Mooney, against Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Nosrat, Amir Hossein, represented by Cate Legal Group, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2022 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 16, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 16, 2023Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 26, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 25, 2024Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: August 09, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 25, 2024Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: August 09, 2023Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Notice Filed
Date: October 16, 2023Objection Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Evidentiary Objections Filed Electronically
Date: January 25, 2024Compendium of Exhibits ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 25, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 25, 2024Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 08, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 13, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 06, 2023Answer Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: October 24, 2023Declaration re:
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 07, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 27, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 01, 2022Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 06, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
May 30, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 08, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed of Boel Magnusson |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection Filed | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed in reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically Separate Statement ISO Opposition To Summary Judgment Motion |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rqst for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition Filed Electronically Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition To Summary Judgment Motion |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Evidentiary Objections Filed Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.