Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Olmedo, Jazlyn, Salas, Elena, Salas, Louis, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Peck Law Group, Apc, against Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc, Does 2 Through 200, Hdmc Holdings, L.L.C., Hi-Desert Continuing Care Center, represented by Agajanian Mcfall Weiss Tetreault & Crist, Agajanian Mcfall Weiss & Tetreault Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 07, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 14, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: May 19, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 19, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: June 27, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: October 11, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Comment:
Date: July 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Order To Show Cause Re:
Date: May 04, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 29, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 17, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: October 06, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: November 02, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: May 22, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Comment:
Date: July 14, 2022Comment:
Date: June 29, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: May 04, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Answer Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: April 27, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: June 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of continuance of trial setting conference, filed 6/7/23 |
|
June 07, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Advanced Jury Fees Posted Notice of Posting Jury Fees by Defendany Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc. |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Balance Due on Case | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.