Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Foell & Elder, against Does 1 Through 10, Lopez, Alonso, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2022 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case number is CIVSB2214938. The plaintiff is Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp. doing business as Time Finance Company, and the defendant is Alonso Lopez. The comp...
Proof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed
Date: October 24, 2022Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Declaration Pursuant to CCP585(d) Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Declaration re:
Date: February 28, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: February 28, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: September 06, 2022Judgment by Court filed
Date: June 09, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: August 23, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 01, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 01, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Gilbert, Ronald J |
||
August 03, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Williams, David A |
||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court filed | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP585(d) Filed | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: PRE JUDGMENT INTEREST |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Filed as to Does Only | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Packet Received | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed Proof of personal service filed by plaintiff on 10/24/22 |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.