Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wiest, Pamela, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joseph Kaufman & Associates, Inc., against Does 1-10, General Motors, Llc, represented by The Erskine Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case is titled Pamela Wiest vs. General Motors, LLC, with the case number CIVSB2214730. The complaint is for restitution and damages, alleging a violation of t...
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 29, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 01, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 01, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 11, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.