Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Hernandez, Katherine Marie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Gilbert Maturino, against Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, County Of San Bernardino, Does 1-25, Kim Do, Jennifer, Lyons M.D., John Michael, (total of 5) See All represented by Thompson & Colegate, Thompson & Colegate Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 26, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 05, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 27, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 10, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 03, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 13, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 27, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 13, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 13, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 02, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 11, 2024 | Department S34 - SBJC | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEFENDANTS MEDIATION BRIEF |
|
December 06, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed filed by Plaintiff filed on 11/13/23 |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Stipulation of Parties to Continue the Voluntary Court Sponsored Mediation |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant With Prejudice |
|
May 23, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received ITSCS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.