Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Drew, Claire Eliza, Egreen Transport Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adli Law Group P.C., against Doe Parties 1-100, Doe Parties 2-100, Flying Bird Logistics, Inc., Lin, Chao Hui, Roes 1-100, (total of 6) See All represented by Law Offices Of Bin Li, Law Offices Of Bin Li & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer Filed
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 26, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: January 16, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 24, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 08, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 10, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 20, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: September 10, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Motion to Compel Responses
Date: August 11, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 24, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 20, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 25, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: November 30, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 27, 2022Reply To:
Date: September 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
February 22, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION SUBPOENA |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received *COURTESY COPY* of notice of withdrawal of motion to compel deposition subpoena |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received *COURTESY COPY* of 03/11/24 motion to compel deposition subpoena |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to compel deposition subpoena served on non-party Principal Global Investors LLC | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60.00 PAID VIA EFILE |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice After Hearing |
|
October 19, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.