Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bankers Auto Acceptance Corp., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Foell & Elder, against Does 1-10, Trejo, Cristina, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2022 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 27, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Gilbert, Ronald J |
||
July 28, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Williams, David A |
||
June 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court filed | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Notice of re-assignment of case for all purposes was recieved and is undeliverable without a forwarding address |
|
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Filed as to Does Only | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Interest Calculation | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Entry of Judg under CCP 1033 filed | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP585(d) Filed | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Packet Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.