Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Negrete Pena, Juan Antonio, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Does 2-50, Johnson, Tiffany, Johnson, Tiffiany, Lowe'S Home Centers, Llc, represented by Tharpe & Howell, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Corey G Lee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 08, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: March 23, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 11, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 07, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 28, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 16, 2023Answer Filed
Date: November 08, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 03, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: July 18, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 15, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 15, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 05, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 10, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 07, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 16, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 21, 2023Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: February 17, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 28, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs Juan Antonio Negrete Pena on complaint filed 07/05/22 |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Order filed | |
July 18, 2023 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed Filed jointly - Hearing Date 7/18/23 |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Protective order |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Protective Order |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: on Motion for Entry of Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.