Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Curtis, Mary Ruth, Estate Of Mary Ruth Curtis, Heine, Nancy, Hudson, Carol, Kibler, Colleen, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mccune Law Group, Mccune Wright Arevalo Vercoski Kusel Weck Brandt Apc, Mccune Wright Arevalo Llp, against Atria Senior Living, Inc, Brown, Jeff, Does 1 To 50, Holiday Al General Partner Ii Llc, Holiday Al Management Sub Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Moore & Lee, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 04, 2023Declaration re:
Date: April 06, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: January 24, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: February 02, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 08, 2024Reply Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 25, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 23, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Balance Due on Case
Date: January 31, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 07, 2022Declaration re:
Date: January 24, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 24, 2023Motion re:
Date: January 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically RESPONSE TO THE COURT S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AGAINST MISSION COMMONS RETIREMENT RESIDENCE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, HOLIDAY AL GENERAL PARTNER II LLC, HOLIDAY AL MANAGEMENT SUB LLC, AND ATRIA SENIOR LIVING, INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; DECLARATION OF DEVON B. MOORE IN SUPPORT THEREOF |
|
February 13, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
May 23, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed Hearing date, 5/23/23, S30 |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed Filed by Plainiffs' Mary Ruth Curtis, Estate of Mary Ruth Curtis, Nancy Heine, Carol Hudson, Colleen Kibler, Sharon O'Shaughnessy on 5/5/23 |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.