Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chacon, Amy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Dublas Paniagua, against Does 1-10 Inclusive, Husson, Rajbir S., represented by Law Office Of Anju Multani, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Amy Chacon against Rajbir S. Husson and other individuals. The complaint alleges multiple violations, including violation of California Civil Code §51.9 and Unruh Act §§51 and 52, assault, battery, intentio...
Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 23, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: July 18, 2022Reply Filed
Date: May 25, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: December 12, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 08, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 18, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 19, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 07, 2023Motion re:
Date: November 17, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 14, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 15, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: July 18, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 12, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 04, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 28, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: December 11, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 01, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
February 01, 2024 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition filed by defendant |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF AMY CHACON;REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF DUBLAS PANIAGUA |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff | |
December 11, 2023 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
December 11, 2023 |
Department R1 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.