Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pennington, Nicole, Taylor, Mya, filed a(n) Product Liability Unlimited case against Does 1-10, Quintanar, Rosali, represented by Brian P. Kamel & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2022 |
CategoryProduct Liability Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice
Date: March 15, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Declaration re:
Date: February 08, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: March 14, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 11, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 05, 2022Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: August 29, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: November 01, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 07, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 30, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 03, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 09, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated Master File: CIVDS1914763 |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Rosali Quintanar dba Affordable Family Vision Centers Demurrer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action Cause of Action Five - Breach of Implied Warranty of Mechantability |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Notice of Related Case - Duplicate filing. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Related Case CIVDS1914763 |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Balance Due on Case $60.00 for motion fee |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to plaintiffs first amended complaint ; memorandum of points and authorities filed by defendant Rosali Quintanar et al |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Yee Lam , Esq. re; Demurrer to plaintiffs first amended complaint ; memorandum of points and authorities filed by defendant Rosali Quintanar et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.