Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rosas, Mario, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices, Apc, against Does 1 Through 10, Ford Motor Company, Sunrise Ford, represented by Mortenson Taggart Adams Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Mario Rosas, against Ford Motor Company and others. The attorney representing the plaintiff is Tionna Donn from Strategic Legal Practices, a Professional Corporation. The case is filed in the...
Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: November 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 21, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: February 07, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed Electronically
Date: February 07, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed Electronically
Date: February 07, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 21, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 17, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 25, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: December 01, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: October 19, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 07, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 28, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 22, 2022Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 01, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 17, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: August 28, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 01, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
October 17, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
March 01, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 15, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 13, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 08, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Declaration Filed Supplemental Declaration of Tyson R. Smith in Support of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents (Declarations) |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Objections Filed Electronically Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Erich Kemnitz in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One (Objections) |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Objections Filed Electronically Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of John Isaac Southerland in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Companys Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One (Objections) |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents (Comment) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.