Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Mcdowell, Rhonda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quill & Arrow, Llp, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc, Does 1-10, represented by Wilson Turner Kosmo Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Rhonda McDowell against American Honda Motor Co., Inc. The complaint alleges three causes of action: violation of the Song-Beverly Act - breach of express warranty, violation of the Song-Beverly Act - breach of implied warr...
Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 26, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 16, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 26, 2024Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 15, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 26, 2024Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Stipulation Filed re:
Date: January 25, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 21, 2022Answer Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: November 15, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 09, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 22, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: January 25, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 26, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Amended Proof of Personal Service of Summons & Cmplt filed
Date: October 19, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 16, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 16, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 22, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: November 15, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: November 17, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 16, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 22, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 15, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 16, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 29, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 22, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
March 08, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically Separate Statement ISO Opposition filed by def American Honda Motor Co |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration ISO def American Honda opposition |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Opposition | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion Filed | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed. | |
February 01, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.