Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Av Automotive, Inc., Vartanian, Arsen H, Portillo, Edgar, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Ferris & Britton, A Professional Corporation, against Does 1-60, Does 1 Through 35, Vartanian, Vahak, represented by Prince, David Louis, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Arsen H. Vartanian and AV Automotive, Inc. against Vahak Vartanian, doing business as Vartanian on Wheels and VOW Automotive, and other unnamed defendants. The plaintiffs are seeking various forms of relief...
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 11, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 20, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 01, 2023Points and Authorities in Support of Motion Rcvd & Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 04, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 29, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Proof of Service
Date: February 14, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 05, 2024Proof of Service
Date: February 05, 2024Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 09, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 05, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 14, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 05, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 10, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: December 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: December 15, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 21, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: April 24, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 20, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 07, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 10, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: February 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 17, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: January 19, 2024Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 28, 2023Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Demurrer Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 01, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 22, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: January 19, 2024Notice
Date: June 02, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 18, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 19, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Balance Due on Case
Date: April 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 20, 2024Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: September 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 20, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 25, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 06, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 07, 2024Reply Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: June 02, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
March 19, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Ruling on Submitted Matter | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Matter taken under submission | |
February 22, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Minute Order dated: 02/22/2024 |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically 1.REPLY BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS, ARSEN VARTANIAN AND EDGAR PORTILLO, TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO VAHAK VARTANIANS CROSS-COMPLAINT |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically 2.REPLY BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS, ARSEN VARTANIAN AND EDGAR PORTILLO, TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES ALLEGATIONS AND PRAYER FROM VAHAK VARTANIANS CROSS-COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.