Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gutierrez, Elsa Eloisa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Accident Fighters, Apc, against Does 1 To 50, Food 4 Less Of California, Inc, Food 4 Less Of Southern California, Inc., The Kroger Co., represented by Liebman, Quigley & Sheppard, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Elsa Eloisa Gutierrez against Food 4 Less of Southern California, Inc., The Kroger Co., and Does 1 to 50. The complaint alleges causes of action for property damage, wrongful death, and personal injur...
Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 03, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: August 10, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: November 07, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: November 22, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: November 22, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 27, 2022Answer Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: November 22, 2022Answer Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 26, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: November 22, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: September 08, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: March 16, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 22, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: September 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: January 24, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.