Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Kenneth J. Freed, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Hospice Care At Home Inc., Hospice Care At Home, Inc, Providence Hospice Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 2022 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: December 28, 2023Judgment by Court filed
Date: June 27, 2023Proof of Service
Date: January 03, 2024Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: December 28, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: January 03, 2024Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: February 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: December 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: February 14, 2023Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Declaration re:
Date: December 19, 2023Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 23, 2024Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 18, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Ex Parte Correspondence Received And Returned Not Read
Date: June 30, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 23, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Examination Filed Hospice Care at Home Inc |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Application for Order for Examination Filed re; Providence Hospice Inc |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
January 24, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed To Request to Continue Application for Order for Appearance and Examination |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE - CIVIL |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request Filed Re: REQUEST TO CONTINUE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.