Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Campos, Haydee Cruz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Does 1-10, represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by the law firm Knightlaw Group on behalf of their client, Haydee Cruz Campos, in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The defendant named in the complaint is American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California...
Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 04, 2023Exhibit List Filed Electronically
Date: October 30, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 02, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: October 31, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: November 01, 2023Witness List Filed Electronically
Date: October 30, 2023Reply Filed
Date: September 29, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: October 07, 2022Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: May 25, 2023Memorandum Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 28, 2024Notice Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: October 31, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 20, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: October 31, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Motion re:
Date: November 08, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 27, 2024Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: November 01, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 10, 2022Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: October 31, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 16, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: August 18, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: October 25, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Proof of Service
Date: October 19, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: July 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 20, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: November 01, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 17, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 28, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: October 25, 2023Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: October 31, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 25, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 19, 2023Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: November 01, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: October 07, 2022Motion in Limine re: Filed Electronically
Date: October 25, 2023Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
March 07, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
March 05, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFF S AMENDED REPLY TO DEFENDANT S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Leave to File FAC - PART II |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Mtn for Leave to File FAC |
|
November 27, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed | |
November 16, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.