Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Espinosa, Celia, Espinosa, Eduardo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Does 1 Through 10, represented by Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 30, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 30, 2023Points and Authorities in Support of Motion Rcvd & Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 07, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 28, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Answer Filed
Date: November 09, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: July 11, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Points and Authorities in Support of Motion Rcvd & Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Reply Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Reply Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 24, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 09, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 15, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 28, 2022Reply Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: November 28, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 31, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
June 17, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
June 13, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
June 13, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
February 01, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application DEF AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO, INC'S EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES; DECL OF ARIEL N. REDFERN |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 60.00 ck for ex parte fees |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed $150 ck paid 06/02/23 |
|
May 08, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.