Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barrinuevo, Licia, Corley-Emerueh, Denise, Elder & Spencer, Llp, Greenwood, Dorcey, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Elder & Spencer, Llp, against Does 1 Through 50, Group Xiv Properties, Lp, Hightower Management, Inc., Pama Management, Inc., represented by Stratman & Williams-Abrego, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended complaint filed by plaintiffs Denise Corley-Emerueh, Dorcey Greenwood, and Licia Barrinuevo against defendants Group XIV Properties, LP, PAMA Management, Inc., Hightower Management, Inc., and Does 1 through 50. The p...
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: August 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 02, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 24, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 19, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 06, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 06, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: August 31, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 13, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 13, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: June 15, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed with prejudice - filed by plaintiff |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; This document has already been filed on 6/15/23. Please see attached. |
|
June 27, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $3.88 cc payment paid 8/1/23 for fax filing fees |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Notice of Settlement of Entire Case |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.