Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Hart, Eloise, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Stafford Hamlin, Walls, Larry Dean, against Does 1-5, Estate Of Damien Hart, Hart, Damien, Usaa General Indeminity Company, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Eloise Hart against the Estate of Damien Hart. The jurisdiction of the case is in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The complaint is not ...
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: January 17, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 03, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 23, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 01, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 04, 2023Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: April 16, 2024Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 22, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: November 16, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 05, 2022Notice Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 06, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: September 16, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 24, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 21, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 21, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 19, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 21, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 07, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 29, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: March 29, 2024Comment:
Date: April 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset ON COURT'S MOTION, HEARINGS PREVIOUSLY SET ON, 04/23/2024 AND 05/09/2024 HAVE BEEN CONTINUED TO 05/23/2024. PARTIES EMAILED NOTIFICATION |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Electronically filed (Comment) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Comment: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #15025094 rejected due to the quality of the document is not clear to read what is on the document |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Stafford Hamlin in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Deposition of Witness |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
January 09, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.