Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vallejo, Jose Guadalupe, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Consumer Law Experts Pc, against Does 1 Through 50, Ford Motor Company, represented by Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 01, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 04, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: May 10, 2022Declaration re:
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: May 10, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: June 15, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 11, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.