Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Richard Bozner, Candyce E. Bozner As Trustees Of The Bozner Family Trust Dated December 16, 1991, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jacobson, Thomas Norwood, against Does 1 Through 100, Lilia Navarro, As Trustee Of The Navarro Trust Dated May 1, 2007, Luis Navarro, As Trustee Of The Navarro Trust Dated May 1, 2007, represented by Buffington Law Firm, Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case number is CIVSB2200084. The plaintiffs in this case are Richard Bozner, Candyce E Bozner, and the Trustees of the Bozner Family Trust. The defendants are ...
Request Filed Re:
Date: July 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 27, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 29, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 21, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 27, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 02, 2024Request Filed Re:
Date: October 31, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 21, 2024Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: February 28, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 14, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 04, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 21, 2024Reply Filed
Date: February 21, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 07, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 23, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Advanced Jury Fees Posted
Date: August 25, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 05, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 05, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: February 14, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 01, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: copies of minute order and Court Ruling |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Submitted Matter re: Motion to Enforce Settlement |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Comment: File retained in S32 for 3/5/24 TSC |
|
February 28, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF CANDYCE BOZNER IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - Hearing Date 2/28/24 |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF THOMAS N. JACOBSON IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT - Hearing Date 2/28/24 |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND FOR AWARD OF SANCTIONS - Hearing Date 2/28/24 |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Jim D Williams ISO oppostion |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion Filed Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.