Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garcia, Francisco A, Garcia, Lesly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lemon Law Associates Of California, against Does 1 To 10, Ford Motor Company, represented by Wilson Turner Kosmo Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 04, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: February 04, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 08, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 19, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.