Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Renteria, Maritsa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices, Apc, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Fca Us, Llc, Victorville Motors Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, represented by Gordon Rees Scully Mansuhani, Gordon Rees Scully Manuskhani, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Maritsa Renteria against FCA US, LLC, Victorville Motors Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, and other unidentified defendants. Maritsa Renteria is a resident of California. FCA US, LLC is a corporation registered in Delaware and cond...
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 16, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: February 07, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 14, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 14, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
August 09, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Re: attorney's fees, costs, and expenses |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received Joint stipulation re: attorney's fees, costs and expenses [proposed] order |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received *COURTESY COPY* of Joint stipulation re: attorney's fees, costs and expenses |
|
July 20, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
February 28, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) filed by Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.