Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Macias, Monique, San Bernardino City Unified School District, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by The Rudman Law Firm, Apc, against Ccs Contractors, Inc., Couts Heating And Cooling, Inc., Couts Heating & Cooling, Inc., Doe 1, Doe 2, (total of 13) See All represented by Murchison & Cumming, Tyson & Mendes, Tyson & Mendes, Llp, Tyson & Mendez Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer Filed
Date: June 08, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 29, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: March 27, 2024Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: September 15, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 15, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 17, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 24, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 08, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: January 17, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 13, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 29, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 06, 2022Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: November 16, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 08, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 09, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Proof of Electronic Service
Date: September 15, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: September 15, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 16, 2023Amendment to Complaint Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Declaration re:
Date: September 15, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: July 14, 2022Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: January 17, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 21, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 28, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 09, 2024Proof of Service
Date: January 17, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 15, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 25, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 30, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
July 18, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 15, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 04, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically REPLY OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT CCS CONTRACTORS, INC. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging of Exhibits Notice of Lodging Index of Exhibits in support of Opposition to Defendant CCS Contractors' Motion For Summary Adjudication |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection #14778799- Your filing is being rejected in part; Notice of lodging is an ineligible document for eFile |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed DEFENDANT COUTS HEATING AND COOLING, INC. S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED AND UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CCS CONTRACTORS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF CHRISTIAN M. FOSTER IN SUPPORT OF COUTS HEATING AND COOLING, INC. S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CCS CONTRACTORS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.